Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Minority Business Enterprise Program – Public–Private Partnerships, Offshore Wind Projects, and Video Lottery Terminals
Sponsored by
Delegates D. Barnes, Acevero, Barron, Branch, Brooks, Crutchfield, D.M. Davis, Fennell, Haynes, Ivey, Lehman, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Smith, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Wells, Holmes, Lierman, and Love
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing, under certain circumstances, that the provisions of the Minority Business Enterprise Program apply to public-private partnerships; prohibiting the Board of Public Works from approving a public-private partnership agreement until the reporting agency, in consultation with certain entities, establishes certain minority business enterprise goals and procedures; requiring that approved applicants for certain wind projects comply with the Minority Business Enterprise Program to a certain extent; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0442
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {290213/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (123-10)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
51A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
Text - First - Public-Private Partnership Agreements - Minority Business Enterprise Program
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {290213/1 Adopted 49
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Text - Third - Minority Business Enterprise Program – Public–Private Partnerships, Offshore Wind Projects, and Video Lottery Terminals
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (123-10) 50
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 51A
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:44 PM