Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hate Crimes - False Statement to a Law Enforcement Officer
Sponsored by
Delegate C. Jackson
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying that the making of a certain false statement to a law enforcement officer may form the basis for a certain hate crime.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0400
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
6/23/2020
Legislative Date
6/23/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Hate Crimes - False Statement to a Law Enforcement Officer
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Hate Crimes - False Statement to a Law Enforcement Officer
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-6)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 6/23/2020 6/23/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Hate Crimes - False Statement to a Law Enforcement Officer
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Hate Crimes - False Statement to a Law Enforcement Officer
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Third Reading Passed (130-6) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:33 PM
Click to return on the top page