Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Utility Regulation - Consideration of Climate and Labor
Sponsored by
Delegate Charkoudian
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of the Environment to prepare a certain recommendation in connection with certain issues considered by the Public Service Commission; requiring the Secretary of Natural Resources to incorporate an evaluation of the impact of certain electric power plants on climate change into the Power Plant Research Program; requiring the Commission to consider the maintenance of fair and stable labor standards and the protection of the global climate in supervising and regulating certain public service companies; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0083
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/28/2020
Legislative Date
8/28/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Utility Regulation - Consideration of Climate and Labor
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2021
Legislative Date
1/12/2021
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/28/2020 8/28/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Utility Regulation - Consideration of Climate and Labor
House 1/12/2021 1/12/2021 Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/29/2021 12:44 PM
Click to return on the top page