Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges - County Government Consent Requirement - Expansion
Sponsored by
Delegates Lehman, Lierman, Acevero, Bagnall, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barron, Bartlett, Boyce, Bridges, Carey, Carr, Chang, Charkoudian, Conaway, Crosby, Crutchfield, Cullison, D.M. Davis, Ebersole, Feldmark, W. Fisher, Grammer, Guyton, Healey, Hettleman, Ivey, Johnson, Kelly, Kerr, Korman, R. Lewis, Love, Luedtke, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Proctor, Queen, Reznik, Saab, Shetty, Smith, Solomon, Stewart, Terrasa, Turner, Valderrama, Walker, Wilkins, Williams, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding to all counties in the State a prohibition on State agencies constructing within the nine Eastern Shore counties a toll road, toll highway, or toll bridge without the consent of a majority of the affected counties.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0229
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0102 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges - County Government Consent Requirement - Expansion
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:43 PM