Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juveniles – Sexting
Sponsored by
Delegate Clippinger
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a certain mitigating factor in a certain juvenile court proceeding against a child for a certain violation; requiring and authorizing the juvenile court to take certain actions in making a certain disposition on a certain finding; prohibiting the juvenile court from taking certain actions in making a certain disposition on a certain finding; establishing that a child who is found by the juvenile court to have violated a certain provision of law is not subject to certain sex offender registration; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Obscene Matter - Sexting by Minor
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {802516/2 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Juveniles – Sexting
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Law - Obscene Matter - Sexting by Minor
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments {802516/2 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Juveniles – Sexting
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47AClick to view Recorded Media
(   11-203, 11-207, 11-208 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:42 PM
Click to return on the top page