Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tax Sales – Owner–Occupied Residential Property
Sponsored by
Delegates Long and Arikan
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to withhold owner-occupied residential property from tax sale during the period from June 1, 2021, through June 30, 2023; and providing for the termination of the Act on June 30, 2023.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/01/2020
Legislative Date
9/01/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Tax Sales – Owner–Occupied Residential Property
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
20BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Tax Sales – Owner–Occupied Residential Property
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/01/2020 9/01/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Tax Sales – Owner–Occupied Residential Property
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/09/2021 3/01/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 20BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Tax Sales – Owner–Occupied Residential Property
House 3/10/2021 3/02/2021 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2021 2/23/2021 Referred Budget and Taxation 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Favorable Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Second Reading Passed 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 3/17/2021 Returned Passed 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/5/2021 5:24 PM
Click to return on the top page