Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Obsolete Reemployment Provisions
Sponsored by
Delegate M. Jackson (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 136
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Updating and altering certain obsolete provisions relating to the reemployment of certain teachers and principals who are retirees of the Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0236
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {314461/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 9:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 136
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Obsolete Reemployment Provisions
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {314461/1 Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Obsolete Reemployment Provisions
House 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Hearing 3/19 at 9:30 a.m.
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 136
Text - Chapter - Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Obsolete Reemployment Provisions
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:41 PM
Click to return on the top page