Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Agriculture – License to Produce Hemp – Limitation
Sponsored by
Delegate Cardin
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a certain licensing requirement for producing hemp in the State; prohibiting the Department of Agriculture from issuing a license to a person to produce hemp if the Department determines that the land subject to a license application is located within 25 feet of a property or properties with three or more individual residences, unless the person agrees to produce hemp in an indoor facility that exhausts its fumes to the outside with an approved apparatus; requiring the Department to make a certain determination; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0562
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0574 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/29/2020
Legislative Date
9/29/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Agriculture – License to Produce Hemp – Limitation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/29/2020 9/29/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Agriculture – License to Produce Hemp – Limitation
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/29/2021 12:43 PM
Click to return on the top page