Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Protective Orders - Relief Eligibility - Rape and Sexual Offenses
Sponsored by
Delegates Atterbeary, Bartlett, Conaway, Crutchfield, D.M. Davis, Dumais, W. Fisher, J. Lewis, Lopez, Moon, Shetty, and Williams
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 132
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Removing rape and certain sexual offenses from the list of offenses alleged to have been committed by a certain respondent against a certain victim for which a peace order petition may be filed under certain circumstances; and altering the definition of "person eligible for relief" for purposes of certain provisions of law relating to domestic violence protective orders to include an individual who alleges the commission of certain acts against the individual by a certain respondent.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0210
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0122 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Protective Orders - Relief Eligibility - Rape and Sexual Offenses
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Protective Orders - Relief Eligibility - Rape and Sexual Offenses
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (122-17)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {798471/1
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Carter) Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {798471/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (27-18)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
52AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (123-8)
Proceedings
52AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Protective Orders - Relief Eligibility - Rape and Sexual Offenses
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 132
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Protective Orders - Relief Eligibility - Rape and Sexual Offenses
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Protective Orders - Relief Eligibility - Rape and Sexual Offenses
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing canceled
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Protective Orders - Relief Eligibility - Rape and Sexual Offenses
House 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Third Reading Passed (122-17) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {798471/1 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Carter) Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {798471/1 Adopted 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (27-18) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 House Concurs Senate Amendments 52AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (123-8) 52AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Protective Orders - Relief Eligibility - Rape and Sexual Offenses
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 132
Text - Chapter - Protective Orders - Relief Eligibility - Rape and Sexual Offenses
(   4-501 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:41 PM
Click to return on the top page