Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sexual Solicitation of a Minor – Solicitation Through Parent, Guardian, or Custodian – Prohibition and Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegates Pippy, Atterbeary, Arikan, Bartlett, Cardin, Cox, Crutchfield, D.M. Davis, W. Fisher, Grammer, Griffith, J. Lewis, Lopez, Malone, Shetty, Wilson, and McComas
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 128
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from knowingly and with a certain intent soliciting the consent of a parent, guardian, or custodian of a minor, or a law enforcement officer posing as a parent, guardian, or custodian of a minor, to engage in certain prohibited sexual acts with the minor; and establishing and altering certain penalties.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0231
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {552914/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 128
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Sexual Solicitation of a Minor – Solicitation Through Parent, Guardian, or Custodian – Prohibition and Penalties
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {552914/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Sexual Solicitation of a Minor – Solicitation Through Parent, Guardian, or Custodian – Prohibition and Penalties
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Returned Passed 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 128
Text - Chapter - Sexual Solicitation of a Minor – Solicitation Through Parent, Guardian, or Custodian – Prohibition and Penalties
(   3-324 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:41 PM
Click to return on the top page