Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cemeteries - Perpetual Care - Distribution From Perpetual Care Trust Fund
Sponsored by
Delegates Krebs, Bagnall, Charles, Cullison, Kelly, Kerr, Kipke, R. Lewis, Saab, Bhandari, Chisholm, Hill, Johnson, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Reilly, Szeliga, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a distribution from a perpetual care trust fund made under certain circumstances to be used only for the perpetual care of the cemetery, including the maintenance of the grounds, roads, and paths and the repair and renewal of buildings; permitting a cemetery to select a certain method of distribution; requiring a cemetery to submit to the Director of the Office of Cemetery Oversight a statement attesting that the cemetery's method of distribution will not result in insufficient protection of the trust fund's principal; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0483
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {846386/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Cemeteries - Perpetual Care - Distribution From Perpetual Care Trust Fund
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments {846386/1 Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Cemeteries - Perpetual Care - Distribution From Perpetual Care Trust Fund
House 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Referred Finance 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:41 PM
Click to return on the top page