Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole Reform
Sponsored by
Delegate Proctor
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing that inmates serving a term of life imprisonment may be paroled without the Governor's approval after serving 30 years without application of diminution of confinement credits.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0300 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/01/2020
Legislative Date
10/01/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole Reform
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2021
Legislative Date
1/12/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/01/2020 10/01/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole Reform
House 1/12/2021 1/12/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2021 9:15 AM
Click to return on the top page