Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law – Person in a Position of Authority – Sexual Offenses With a Minor
Sponsored by
Delegate Love
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "person in a position of authority" for purposes of a certain prohibition against engaging in a sexual act, sexual contact, or vaginal intercourse with a minor to include an individual under contract with a child care facility, certain commercial or nonprofit instructional programs, sports, scouting, recreational activities, camps, religious institutions or any unit of government; prohibiting a certain violation from being considered a lesser included crime of another crime; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/20/2020
Legislative Date
10/20/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/20/2020 10/20/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Law – Person in a Position of Authority – Sexual Offenses With a Minor
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/29/2021 12:42 PM
Click to return on the top page