Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victims of Crime - Private Room
Sponsored by
Delegate Guyton
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Victim Services to develop a poster to notify a victim of the right to request a certain private room in a law enforcement agency or unit when reporting a crime, other than homicide, that primarily involves injury to a person; requiring a certain law enforcement agency to display a poster developed by the State Board of Victim Services informing a victim of the right to request a private room; and requiring a certain law enforcement agency to provide a certain private room to a certain victim.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0484
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1294 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/08/2020
Legislative Date
7/08/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Victims of Crime - Private Room
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Victims of Crime - Private Room
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/08/2020 7/08/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Victims of Crime - Private Room
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/16/2021 2/16/2021 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/18/2021 2/18/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Victims of Crime - Private Room
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2021 2/15/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/25/2021 3:34 PM
Click to return on the top page