Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Support, Custody, and Visitation - Award of Expenses - Suit Money
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Adding suit money to the expenses that the court is authorized, at any point in a certain proceeding, to award to a certain party under certain circumstances in a case concerning child support, custody, or visitation and after making certain considerations; adding suit money to the expenses that the court is required to award to a certain party under certain circumstances and absent a certain finding; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/26 (Delegate J. Lewis) Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {512410/1 Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (126-8)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Child Support, Custody, and Visitation - Award of Expenses - Suit Money
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing canceled
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Motion Special Order until 2/26 (Delegate J. Lewis) Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Floor Committee Amendment {512410/1 Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Child Support, Custody, and Visitation - Award of Expenses - Suit Money
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Third Reading Passed (126-8) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
(   12-103 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:39 PM
Click to return on the top page