Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Law - Informal Adjustment
Sponsored by
Delegate Valentino-Smith
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the juvenile court to refer a certain matter to the Department of Juvenile Services for a certain informal adjustment if the time for a certain adjudicatory hearing has been waived and the petition is not the result of an unsuccessful informal adjustment; providing a certain exception to the requirement that the court hold an adjudicatory hearing; and requiring a certain petition to be dismissed if a certain informal adjustment is successfully completed.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0842 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/13/2020
Legislative Date
10/13/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Informal Adjustment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/13/2020 10/13/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Informal Adjustment
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:24 PM
Click to return on the top page