Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Out-of-Pocket Maximums and Cost-Sharing Requirements - Calculation
Sponsored by
Delegate P. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, to the extent authorized under federal law, certain entities to include payments made by certain persons when calculating certain contributions to an out-of-pocket maximum or a cost-sharing requirement for an insured, a subscriber, or a member; and applying the Act to all policies, contracts, and health benefit plans issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on or after January 1, 2022.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0290
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1360 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/21/2020
Legislative Date
10/21/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/21/2020 10/21/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Health Insurance - Out-of-Pocket Maximums and Cost-Sharing Requirements - Calculation
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/29/2021 12:42 PM
Click to return on the top page