Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
County Boards and Public and Nonpublic Prekindergarten Programs and Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegate Wilkins
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a county board, public prekindergarten program, primary or secondary school, or nonpublic prekindergarten program or primary or secondary school that receives State funds from discriminating against a person, refusing enrollment of a prospective student, expelling a current student, or withholding privileges from certain individuals, or taking certain retaliatory actions on the basis of race, ethnicity, color, religion, sex, age, national origin, marital status, sexual orientation, gender identity, or disability; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0098
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/12/2020
Legislative Date
10/12/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/04/2021
Legislative Date
1/04/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/04/2021
Legislative Date
1/04/2021
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {265460/1 Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (92-45)
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/12/2020 10/12/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - County Boards and Public and Nonpublic Prekindergarten Programs and Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition
House 1/04/2021 1/04/2021 Hearing canceled
House 1/04/2021 1/04/2021 Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2021 2/22/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Favorable with Amendments {265460/1 Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - County Boards and Public and Nonpublic Prekindergarten Programs and Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Third Reading Passed (92-45) 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Age
(   2-303,   26-701 through 26-706, 4-108   )
Last Updated: 2/26/2021 3:08 PM
Click to return on the top page