Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Boat Act - Abandoned or Sunken Vessels - Removal
Sponsored by
Delegates Kipke, Malone, and Metzgar
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 75
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of an "abandoned or sunken vessel", to mean one that has remained at a location for more than 60 instead of 90 days without the consent of the property owner; requiring the Department of Natural Resources to take an abandoned vessel into custody without providing a notice if it determines that the vessel poses certain hazards; requiring, within 15 days after taking custody of an abandoned vessel, the Department to send a certain notice to the last known owner and each known secured party of the vessel; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0219
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Boat Act - Abandoned or Sunken Vessels - Removal
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {240513/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Boat Act - Abandoned or Sunken Vessels - Removal
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {514933/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Bailey) Adopted
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Readings Passed with Amendments (44-0)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Gilchrist, Lehman and clark01)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Motion Reconsider Third Reading (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Gilchrist, Lehman and clark01)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Senate Recede
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Senate Recede
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 75
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - State Boat Act - Abandoned or Sunken Vessels - Removal
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - State Boat Act - Abandoned or Sunken Vessels - Removal
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing canceled
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing canceled
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments {240513/1 Adopted 43A
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43A
Text - Third - State Boat Act - Abandoned or Sunken Vessels - Removal
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 44
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 45
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {514933/1 Adopted 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Bailey) Adopted 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Third Readings Passed with Amendments (44-0) 51A
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 51A
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 House Requests Senate Recede 51A
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Gilchrist, Lehman and clark01) 51A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 House Requests Senate Recede 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Motion Reconsider Third Reading (Senator Kagan) Adopted 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Gilchrist, Lehman and clark01) 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Senate Recede 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Senate Recede 52A
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Returned Passed 53
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 75
Text - Chapter - State Boat Act - Abandoned or Sunken Vessels - Removal
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/1/2020 2:33 PM