Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Peace Orders - Workplace Violence
Sponsored by
Delegates Atterbeary, Arikan, and Grammer
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Making certain provisions of law relating to the filing, issuance, and modification of certain peace orders and to the shielding of certain court records of certain peace order proceedings apply to certain peace orders filed by certain employers on the basis of certain acts committed against certain employees under certain circumstances; requiring an employer to notify an employee before the employer files a certain petition; providing immunity from civil liability to a certain employer under certain circumstances; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0846
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0640 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Peace Orders - Workplace Violence
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {532113/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Peace Orders - Workplace Violence
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {468878/1
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {468878/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Peace Orders - Workplace Violence
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {532113/1 Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Peace Orders - Workplace Violence
House 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments {468878/1 53AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted 53AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable with Amendments {468878/1 Adopted 53CClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53CClick to view Recorded Media
(   3-1501, 3-1502, 3-1503, 3-1503.1, 3-1504, 3-1505, 3-1506, 3-1510 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:36 PM
Click to return on the top page