Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Complete Streets Program Funding - Traffic and Vehicle Monitoring Systems
Sponsored by
Delegates R. Lewis, Boyce, Conaway, Lierman, Smith, and Wells
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing Baltimore City to recover the costs of implementing and administering a traffic control signal monitoring system, a speed monitoring system, a school bus monitoring camera, or a vehicle height monitoring system; requiring Baltimore City, after recovering costs, to spend the remaining balance of fines collected from the monitoring systems solely on public safety or transportation infrastructure improvements consistent with the purpose and goals of the Complete Streets Program and the Complete Streets Transportation System; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {310410/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Baltimore City - Complete Streets Program Funding - Traffic and Vehicle Monitoring Systems
House 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments {310410/1 Adopted 46
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Complete Streets Program Funding - Traffic and Vehicle Monitoring Systems
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 47A
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:35 PM