Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Parentage and Adoption - Definitions
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "mother" so as to deny inclusion of a gamete donor unless the gamete donor and the child's mother agree in writing that the gamete donor will be a parent of the child, or at the time of the child's conception or birth, the gamete donor is married to the child's mother.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Family Law - Parentage and Adoption - Definitions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2020
Legislative Date
1/14/2020
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {672419/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/19 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2020
Legislative Date
2/19/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Family Law - Parentage and Adoption - Definitions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Family Law - Parentage and Adoption - Definitions
House 1/14/2020 1/14/2020 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments {672419/1 Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Motion Special Order until 2/19 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/19/2020 2/19/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Family Law - Parentage and Adoption - Definitions
House 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
(   5-1001 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:34 PM
Click to return on the top page