Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Estates and Trusts - Rule Against Perpetuities
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 50
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Limiting a statutory exception to the common-law rule against perpetuities that provides that the rule does not apply to an option of a tenant to purchase all or part of the premises leased by the tenant to an option that is exercisable only during the term of the lease; and providing for the prospective application of the Act.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0152
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1360 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Estates and Trusts - Rule Against Perpetuities
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2020
Legislative Date
1/14/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Estates and Trusts - Rule Against Perpetuities
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 50
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Estates and Trusts - Rule Against Perpetuities
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Estates and Trusts - Rule Against Perpetuities
House 1/14/2020 1/14/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 30
Text - Third - Estates and Trusts - Rule Against Perpetuities
House 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 32
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 33
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 49
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Returned Passed 49A
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 50
Text - Chapter - Estates and Trusts - Rule Against Perpetuities
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:34 PM