Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Highway Administration - Construction and Maintenance - Permit Requirements (Nighttime Construction Noise Reduction Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Moon, Charkoudian, Fraser-Hidalgo, Korman, Palakovich Carr, and Solomon
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the State Highway Administration from issuing a permit for work to be conducted on State highways between 10:00 p.m. and 6:00 a.m. the following day unless a zoning official determines that issuing the permit is in the interest of public safety, health, or welfare; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0905
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - State Highway Administration - Construction and Maintenance - Permit Requirements (Nighttime Construction Noise Reduction Act)
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:34 PM