Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State and Local Government and Public Institutions of Higher Education - Teleworking
Sponsored by
Delegate Krimm
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Office of Telework Assistance in the Department of Commerce to establish best practices for telework policies; establishing the Business Telework Assistance Grant Program to assist businesses in implementing telework policies; requiring each governing body of a county or municipality to establish telework programs; requiring the State Court Administrator, the President of the Senate, the Speaker of the House, and the presidents of public institutions of higher education to establish telework programs and guidelines; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0710
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/15/2020
Legislative Date
10/15/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State and Local Government and Private Employers – Teleworking
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2021
Legislative Date
1/11/2021
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {394168/1
Proceedings
17BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted
Proceedings
17BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {394168/1 Adopted
Proceedings
17BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
17BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-22)
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/20/2021
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
4/06/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
4/06/2021
Action
Hearing 4/06 at 2:50 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
4/10/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/15/2020 10/15/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State and Local Government and Private Employers – Teleworking
House 1/11/2021 1/11/2021 Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2021 3/01/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/02/2021 2/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments {394168/1 17BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2021 2/26/2021 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted 17BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2021 2/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments {394168/1 Adopted 17BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2021 2/26/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 17BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State and Local Government and Public Institutions of Higher Education - Teleworking
House 3/04/2021 2/28/2021 Third Reading Passed (100-22) 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2021 2/20/2021 Referred Finance 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/06/2021 4/06/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 4/06/2021 4/06/2021 Hearing 4/06 at 2:50 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 4/10/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Favorable Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Second Reading Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/23/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/29/2021 Returned Passed 48 Click to view Recorded Media
(   3-601, 3-602, 5-1701, 5-1702 )
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 11:20 PM
Click to return on the top page