Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Exemption - Individuals Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined
Sponsored by
Delegate Grammer
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:15 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that the Maryland income tax does not apply to the income of an individual erroneously convicted, sentenced, and confined under State law for a crime the individual did not commit; requiring the Comptroller to adopt regulations to provide procedures for an individual to apply for and be recognized as erroneously convicted, sentenced, and confined under State law for a crime the individual did not commit; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2020
Legislative Date
1/14/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Exemption - Individuals Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined
House 1/14/2020 1/14/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing canceled
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:15 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-104 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:33 PM