Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Trials - Spousal Privilege - Exception
Sponsored by
Delegate Grammer
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that the spouse of a person on trial for a crime may be compelled to testify as an adverse witness if the spouse and the person on trial married after the date on which the alleged crime for which the person is on trial occurred.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Trials - Spousal Privilege - Exception
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Trials - Spousal Privilege - Exception
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-4)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Trials - Spousal Privilege - Exception
House 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Trials - Spousal Privilege - Exception
House 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-4) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:33 PM
Click to return on the top page