Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Pension Systems - Special Disability Retirement Allowance
Sponsored by
Delegates M. Jackson, Lisanti, and McIntosh
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that the appropriate authority of a local pension system offer a special disability retirement allowance to a member if the member is, as determined by the appropriate authority of a local pension system, totally and permanently physically incapacitated for duty arising out of or in the course of the actual performance of duty without willful negligence by the member; exempting the appropriate authority of a local pension system from the requirements of the Act under certain circumstances; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0645 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Local Pension Systems - Special Disability Retirement Allowance
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2020
Legislative Date
1/14/2020
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Local Pension Systems - Special Disability Retirement Allowance
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-1)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Local Pension Systems - Special Disability Retirement Allowance
House 1/14/2020 1/14/2020 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing canceled
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Local Pension Systems - Special Disability Retirement Allowance
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (135-1) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Age
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:33 PM
Click to return on the top page