Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Chesapeake Bay Bridge – Reconstruction Advisory Group and Transportation Facilities Projects
Sponsored by
Delegates Arentz, Bagnall, Carey, Howard, Jacobs, Kipke, Malone, and Saab
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 611
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Chesapeake Bay Bridge Reconstruction Advisory Group for the purpose of providing the Maryland Transportation Authority with an independent, citizen-informed perspective on the Authority's operations at the Chesapeake Bay Bridge; requiring the Advisory Group to assist the Authority in assessing potential concerns and educating the public about certain activity; prohibiting the State or a reporting agency from transferring ownership, operation or management of existing transportation facilities to a certain entity; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0013
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/10/2019
Legislative Date
10/10/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {790410/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Chesapeake Bay Bridge – Reconstruction Advisory Group
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Kelley) Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Motion Reconsider Third Reading (Senator Kelley) Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {399937/1 (Senator Feldman) Adopted
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Readings Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 611
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/10/2019 10/10/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Chesapeake Bay Bridge - Reconstruction Advisory Group and Traffic Study
House 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable with Amendments {790410/1 Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Chesapeake Bay Bridge – Reconstruction Advisory Group
House 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Referred Finance 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Kelley) Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Motion Reconsider Third Reading (Senator Kelley) Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Jennings) Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Floor Amendment {399937/1 (Senator Feldman) Adopted 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Third Readings Passed with Amendments (45-0) 51AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 House Concurs Senate Amendments 51AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 51AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Chesapeake Bay Bridge – Reconstruction Advisory Group and Transportation Facilities Projects
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 611
Text - Chapter - Chesapeake Bay Bridge – Reconstruction Advisory Group and Transportation Facilities Projects
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:33 PM
Click to return on the top page