Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure – Pretrial Release – Pretrial Risk Scoring Instruments
Sponsored by
Delegate Palakovich Carr
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 41
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a jurisdiction that uses a pretrial risk scoring instrument to assist in determining the eligibility for pretrial release of an individual charged with a crime to have an independent validation study of the instrument conducted at least once every 5 years; making an independent validation study conducted in accordance with the Act for a certain instrument used in a certain pretrial services program eligible for funding from the Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0068
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/22/2019
Legislative Date
8/22/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {302818/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 41
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Judiciary
House 8/22/2019 8/22/2019 Pre-filed
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Pretrial Risk Assessment Instruments
House 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments {302818/1 Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure – Pretrial Release – Pretrial Risk Scoring Instruments
House 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 41
Text - Chapter - Criminal Procedure – Pretrial Release – Pretrial Risk Scoring Instruments
(   4-1101, 4-1102, 4-1103, 4-1104 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:32 PM
Click to return on the top page