Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Clean Cars Act of 2021
Sponsored by
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending and altering, for fiscal years 2021 through 2023, the Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment Rebate Program and the vehicle excise tax credit for the purchase of certain electric vehicles; increasing from $1,200,000 to $1,800,000 the amount of rebates that the Maryland Energy Administration may issue; increasing, for purposes of a certain vehicle excise tax credit, the limitation on the maximum total purchase price of certain electric vehicles; reducing the vehicle excise tax credit for certain electric drive vehicles; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/01/2020
Legislative Date
11/01/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Clean Cars Act of 2021
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/01/2020 11/01/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Clean Cars Act of 2021
Last Updated: 2/9/2021 11:25 AM
Click to return on the top page