Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Evidence - Causing Unavailability of Witness
Sponsored by
Delegates Barron, Henson, Grammer, and Malone
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 607
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the standard of proof by which the court must make a certain finding relating to the admission in evidence, during certain criminal trials, of a statement offered against a party who caused the unavailability of the declarant of the statement under certain circumstances; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0064
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/01/2019
Legislative Date
11/01/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Evidence - Causing Unavailability of Witness
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {902917/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Evidence - Causing Unavailability of Witness
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {928272/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-2)
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
52AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
52AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Criminal Procedure - Evidence - Causing Unavailability of Witness
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 607
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Criminal Procedure - Evidence - Causing Unavailability of Witness
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/01/2019 11/01/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Evidence - Causing Unavailability of Witness
House 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Hearing canceled
House 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments {902917/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Evidence - Causing Unavailability of Witness
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Smith) Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {928272/1 Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (43-2) 51AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 House Concurs Senate Amendments 52AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 52AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Criminal Procedure - Evidence - Causing Unavailability of Witness
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 607
Text - Chapter - Criminal Procedure - Evidence - Causing Unavailability of Witness
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:32 PM
Click to return on the top page