Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Proceedings - Fines, Fees, and Costs
Sponsored by
Delegates Barron, D.M. Davis, and Henson
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 35
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing certain provisions of law authorizing the juvenile court to impose certain civil fines against a child found to have committed certain violations; repealing a certain provision of law authorizing the juvenile court to impose certain court costs against a juvenile respondent or the respondent's parent, guardian, or custodian under certain circumstances; repealing a certain provision of law authorizing the juvenile court to assess any party or parent of a child in a certain proceeding for services of a certain attorney; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/13/2019
Legislative Date
9/13/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Juvenile Proceedings - Fines, Fees, and Costs
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2020
Legislative Date
1/07/2020
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47B
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Juvenile Proceedings - Fines, Fees, and Costs
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (109-21)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-12)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 35
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Juvenile Proceedings - Fines, Fees, and Costs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/13/2019 9/13/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Juvenile Proceedings - Fines, Fees, and Costs
House 1/07/2020 1/07/2020 Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47B
Text - Third - Juvenile Proceedings - Fines, Fees, and Costs
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (109-21) 48
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 49
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (33-12) 52
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 52
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 35
Text - Chapter - Juvenile Proceedings - Fines, Fees, and Costs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-8A-19, 3-8A-20, 3-8A-29, 3-8A-32 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:32 PM