Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Secondhand Precious Metal Object Dealers and Pawnbrokers - Exemptions for Auctioneers
Sponsored by
Delegates Parrott and Hartman
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting auctioneers who conduct a certain auction of secondhand precious metal objects owned by a certain estate from the licensing and regulatory requirements for secondhand precious metal object dealers and pawnbrokers; and defining the terms "auction" as a sale of real or personal property by competitive bid of prospective buyers, and "auctioneer" as a person who sells or offers to sell the real or personal property of other persons at auction, with or without receiving consideration, as a bid caller.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/16/2019
Legislative Date
7/16/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/16/2019 7/16/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Secondhand Precious Metal Object Dealers and Pawnbrokers - Exemptions for Auctioneers
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-101, 12-102 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:31 PM