Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - PFAS Chemicals - Prohibitions and Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Love
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 3:45 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting, on or after January 1, 2022, a person from using, manufacturing, or knowingly selling or distributing Class B fire-fighting foam that contains intentionally added PFAS chemicals in the State; prohibiting, on or after January 1, 2022, a person from manufacturing, selling, or distributing a certain rug or carpet in the State; prohibiting, on or after January 1, 2022, a manufacturer or distributor from manufacturing, selling, or distributing certain food packaging in the State; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0195
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/13/2020
Legislative Date
10/13/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment - PFAS Chemicals - Prohibitions and Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2021
Legislative Date
1/21/2021
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 3:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/13/2020 10/13/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Environment - PFAS Chemicals - Prohibitions and Requirements
House 1/21/2021 1/21/2021 Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
House 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 Hearing canceled
House 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 Hearing 2/02 at 3:45 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:21 PM
Click to return on the top page