Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Campaign Material - Alteration of Definition
Sponsored by
Delegate Cardin
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying the definition of "campaign material" by providing that, to meet the definition of "campaign material", the text, graphics, or other images contained in the material must primarily relate to campaign activity for an election; and altering the definition of "campaign material" to include certain material that relates to a political party or that is an automated or pre-recorded oral communication.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/15/2019
Legislative Date
10/15/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law - Campaign Material - Alteration of Definition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2020
Legislative Date
1/07/2020
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/15/2019 10/15/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Election Law - Campaign Material - Alteration of Definition
House 1/07/2020 1/07/2020 Hearing 1/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 13-401 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:31 PM