Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Judges - Election, Retention, and Mandatory Retirement Age
Sponsored by
Delegate Cardin
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to provide for retention elections for judges of the circuit courts; proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution altering the mandatory retirement age for certain judges under certain circumstances; proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to increase the number of years between successive retention elections for judges of the Court of Appeals and Court of Special Appeals; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Constitutional Bill
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/15/2019
Legislative Date
10/15/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Judges - Election, Retention, and Mandatory Retirement Age
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2020
Legislative Date
1/10/2020
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 2:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2020
Legislative Date
1/14/2020
Action
Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2020
Legislative Date
1/14/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Judiciary and Ways and Means
House 10/15/2019 10/15/2019 Pre-filed
Text - First - Judges - Election, Retention, and Mandatory Retirement Age
House 1/10/2020 1/10/2020 Hearing 1/22 at 2:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
House 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 1/14/2020 1/14/2020 Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
House 1/14/2020 1/14/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18B, 3, 3A, 41D, 5A, 5B )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:31 PM