Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Parole - Life Imprisonment
Sponsored by
Delegates Clippinger and Queen
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed (93-41)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering, from 15 years to 20 years or the equivalent of 20 years considering certain allowances, the time period that inmates sentenced to life imprisonment for a crime committed on or after October 1, 2021, must serve before becoming eligible for parole consideration; repealing certain provisions that provide that inmates serving a term of life imprisonment may be paroled only with the Governor's approval, subject to certain provisions; repealing certain provisions that require certain parole decisions be sent to the Governor; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1219 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/08/2020
Legislative Date
10/08/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Correctional Services - Parole - Life Imprisonment
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {563322/1 (Delegate Chisholm) Rejected (41-91)
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {893926/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (38-94)
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {423127/1 (Delegate Parrott) Rejected (40-91)
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Correctional Services - Parole - Life Imprisonment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-41)
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/08/2020 10/08/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Correctional Services - Parole - Life Imprisonment
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Favorable 17 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted 17 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2021 2/27/2021 Favorable Adopted 18 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2021 2/27/2021 Floor Amendment {563322/1 (Delegate Chisholm) Rejected (41-91) 18 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2021 2/27/2021 Floor Amendment {893926/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (38-94) 18 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2021 2/27/2021 Floor Amendment {423127/1 (Delegate Parrott) Rejected (40-91) 18 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2021 2/27/2021 Second Reading Passed 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Correctional Services - Parole - Life Imprisonment
House 3/04/2021 2/28/2021 Third Reading Passed (93-41) 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/4/2021 2:45 PM
Click to return on the top page